Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midland Credit Manag, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Myers , Edward J., against Miller , Dianna, in the jurisdiction of Atchison County, MO, . Atchison County, MO Superior Courts MO-Atchison with HERRON, COREY KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHERRON, COREY KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2022 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAtchison County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Atchison |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: February 17, 2022Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court
Date: May 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Stmnt Judmt Balance Filed | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Stmnt Judmt Balance Filed | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Garnishment Returned Served | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Execution/Garnishment Issued | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 22-GARN-192 for DIANNA MILLER; SERVE MANAGER OR PERSON IN CHARGE; returnable date: 04-OCT-2049; Garnishee: CONAGRA FOODS INC Garnmishment Prepared and Attached for Service by Attorney. |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Execution/Garnish | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Execution/Garnish GARNISHMENT. Filed By: EDWARD J. MYERS \n On Behalf Of: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAG |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court Transcript Judgment Entered. Associated Entries: 05/10/2022 - Req for Transcript Judgment TRANSCRIPT JUDGMENT; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Req for Transcript Judgment | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.