Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems - Chicago Il, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Porto , Anthony Francis Iii, against Hamilton , William Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Atchison County, MO, . Atchison County, MO Superior Courts MO-Atchison with HERRON, COREY KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHERRON, COREY KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2021 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAtchison County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Atchison |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: February 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Judgment filed and entered for the Plaintiff and against the Defendant in the total amount of $1,415.87 plus interest at the rate of 9% per annum. See Judgment for details. Certified copy of Judgment mailed to the Defendant. Filed By: COREY KEITH HERRON |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
February 17, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing Held | |
February 17, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing Held Case called. The Plaintiff appears by local counsel Hurst, the Defendant fails to appear and Judgment by default is granted as requested in the petition filed. Scheduled For: 02/17/2022; 8:59 AM ; COREY KEITH HERRON; Atchison |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Personally Served | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 22-AASM-4; Served To - HAMILTON, WILLIAM THOMAS; Server - SO ATCHISON COUNTY-ROCK PORT; Served Date - 26-JAN-22; Served Time - 13:41:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
January 20, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
January 20, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Case called and continued to 02/17/2022 at 9:00 A for service of Alias summons. CKH Hearing Continued From: 01/20/2022; 8:59 AM Civil Setting |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Note to Clerk eFiling |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.