Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Winona County Health And Human Services, filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill And Developmentally Disabled case against Knoll, Michael J., in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts with Leahy, Mary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeahy, Mary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2022 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill And Developmentally Disabled |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #29 | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Proceeding and Discharging Patient Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #28 | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Judicial Determination Judicial Officer: Leahy, Mary C. Index #27 | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Priority Task Manager Review [R] Index #26 | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #25 | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice to File or Appear - Civil Commitment Index #23 | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #24 | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Schedule Hearing | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Commitment Judicial Officer: Walters, Terrence M. Filed By: Respondent Knoll, Michael J. Index #21 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.