Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Erickson, Deborah R., filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts with Leahy, Mary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeahy, Mary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
|
Affidavit of Mailing Index #16
Date: October 10, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #13
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement to Close Index #37 | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index #36 | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney MICKOW, MARK ALLEN VERNON Index #33 | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Allow Final Acct , Settling Estate, Order of Distrib Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #35 | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Consent to Final Acct-Issuance of Decree-Order of Distrib Index #29 | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #32 | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Inventory Filed By: Personal Representative Erickson, Deborah R.; Petitioner Erickson, Deborah R. Index #27 | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Accounting Filed By: Personal Representative Erickson, Deborah R.; Petitioner Erickson, Deborah R. Index #28 | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Supporting Documentation Index #30 | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition to Allow Final Acctg., Settle and Distribute Estate Filed By: Attorney MICKOW, MARK ALLEN VERNON Index #31 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.