Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Default Hearing filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts with Buytendorp, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBuytendorp, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 25, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Buytendorp, Nancy L. |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 11
Judge: Buytendorp, Nancy L. |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 10
Judge: Buytendorp, Nancy L. |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Schedule Hearing
Judge: Buytendorp, Nancy L. |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Index # 9 (Judicial Officer: Leahy, Mary C. )
Judge: Buytendorp, Nancy L. |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Index # 7
Judge: Buytendorp, Nancy L. |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 8 (Judicial Officer: Leahy, Mary C. )
Judge: Buytendorp, Nancy L. |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default Scheduling Request Index # 6
Judge: Buytendorp, Nancy L. |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 4
Judge: Buytendorp, Nancy L. |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Form 11.1 personal information Index # 5
Judge: Buytendorp, Nancy L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.