Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hearing filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2022 |
CategoryChange Of Name |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 4 | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 2 | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Criminal Background Check - Name Change Index # 1 | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Application for Name Change Index # 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.