Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eviction Hearing filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index # 8 | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Power of Authority in Unlawful Detainer Index # 6 | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 7 | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index # 5 | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index # 4 | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 3 | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Eviction Summons Index # 2 | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint-Civil Index # 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.