Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hidden Valley Management Co., Inc., filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Van Beek, Beau James - Lead Attorney, against Kunda, Amy J., Peterson, Timothy J., in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Proposed Order or Document Index #7
Date: December 02, 2022Certify Personal Service Index #8
Date: December 02, 2022Power of Authority in Unlawful Detainer Index #6
Date: December 02, 2022Certify Personal Service Index #4
Date: November 23, 2022Certify Personal Service Index #5
Date: November 28, 2022Stipulation Index #12
Date: December 13, 2022Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Thompson, Jeffrey D. Index #15
Date: December 13, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #13
Date: December 13, 2022Eviction Summons Index #2
Date: November 22, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3
Date: November 22, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #9
Date: December 05, 2022Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: November 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Defendant Kunda, Amy J.; Defendant Peterson, Timothy J.; Attorney VAN BEEK, BEAU JAMES Index #16 | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation Index #12 | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Thompson, Jeffrey D. Index #15 | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #13 | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 13 | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation Index # 12 | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Instructions Provided Filed By: Defendant Kunda, Amy J. Index #11 | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Instructions Provided Index # 11 | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Defendant Kunda, Amy J.; Defendant Peterson, Timothy J.; Attorney VAN BEEK, BEAU JAMES Index #10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.