Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Court Trial filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Index # 19 | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List Index # 18 | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List Index # 17 | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 16 | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Trial Index # 15 (Judicial Officer: Opat, Matthew J. )
Judge: Opat, Matthew J. |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 14 | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 13 | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Index # 12 (Judicial Officer: Siefken, Kevin )
Judge: Siefken, Kevin |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Representation Index # 11 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.