Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Credit Service Intl Corp, filed a(n) Conciliation case against Crain, Tracy L, in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts with Cajacob, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCajacob, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 10, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
|
Judgment Index #9
Date: January 09, 2023Correspondence Index #7
Date: December 05, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #5
Date: December 05, 2022Power of Attorney Index #6
Date: December 05, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3
Date: October 11, 2022Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Cajacob, John T. Index #8
Date: January 04, 2023Summons Index #2
Date: October 11, 2022Statement of Claim Index #1
Date: October 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #9 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Defendant Crain, Tracy L; Plaintiff Credit Service Intl Corp Index #10 | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Cajacob, John T. Index #8 | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #7 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #5 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Power of Attorney Index #6 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 7 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Power of Attorney Index # 6 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 5 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.