Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Southeast Mechanical Inc, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Novotny, Lee Michael - Lead Attorney, against Vafaei, Mac, represented by Grinde, Paul H - Lead Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts with Leahy, Mary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeahy, Mary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
|
Judgment Judicial Officer: Lallemont, Angela Index #16
Date: June 12, 2023Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Lallemont, Angela Index #18
Date: June 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Vacating Judgment Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #20 | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #19 | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Judicial Officer: Lallemont, Angela Index #16 | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #17 | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Lallemont, Angela Index #18 | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney GRINDE, PAUL H; Attorney NOVOTNY, LEE MICHAEL Index #15 | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Judicial Determination Judicial Officer: Cajacob, John T. Index #13 | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index #14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.