Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sebastian, Kellie, filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Todd County, MN, . Todd County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2022 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationTodd County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Claims Due | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Written Statement of Claim Index # 27 | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Medical Assistance Clearance Index # 26 | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Written Statement of Claim Index # 25 | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Written Statement of Claim Index # 24 | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 23 | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 22 | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 21 | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service of Notice to the Comm of Human Services Index # 20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.