Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Commitment Hearing filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill & Chemically Dependent case in the jurisdiction of Todd County, MN, . Todd County, MN Superior Courts with Benson, Daniel A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenson, Daniel A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2022 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill & Chemically Dependent |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTodd County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 52 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 51 | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | 6-Month Report Index # 50 | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 49 | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 48 | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Authorizing Use of Neuroleptic Medications Index # 47 (Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. )
Judge: Benson, Daniel A. |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 46 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 45 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.