Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Todd County Dept - Social Services, filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill case against Camacho, Alex Vargas, in the jurisdiction of Todd County, MN, . Todd County, MN Superior Courts with Benson, Daniel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenson, Daniel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 02, 2022 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill |
Last RefreshedNovember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTodd County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Respondent CAMACHO, ALEX VARGAS Index #30 | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Proceeding and Discharging Patient Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Filed By: Respondent CAMACHO, ALEX VARGAS; Name Not Available Online; Attorney LINDEMANN, JOHN ERIC; Name Not Available Online; Petitioner Todd County Dept - SOCIAL SERVICES; Name Not Available Online; Attorney WONDERLICH, SCOTT ALAN Index #28 | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Respondent CAMACHO, ALEX VARGAS; Attorney LINDEMANN, JOHN ERIC; Name Not Available Online; Petitioner Todd County Dept - SOCIAL SERVICES; Attorney WONDERLICH, SCOTT ALAN Index #29 | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Index #27 | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | 6-Month Report Index #26 | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Provisional Discharge Index #25 | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | 60-90 Day Commitment Report Index #24 | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Filed By: Attorney LINDEMANN, JOHN ERIC; Petitioner Todd County Dept - SOCIAL SERVICES Index #23 | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #21 | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Respondent CAMACHO, ALEX VARGAS; Name Not Available Online; Attorney LINDEMANN, JOHN ERIC; Petitioner Todd County Dept - SOCIAL SERVICES; Attorney WONDERLICH, SCOTT ALAN Index #22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.