Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bollin, Dennis Duane, filed a(n) Implied Consent case against Commissioner Of Public Safety, in the jurisdiction of Todd County, MN, . Todd County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryImplied Consent |
Last RefreshedNovember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTodd County, MN |
|
Exhibit List Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Index #6
Date: November 14, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #2
Date: September 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Respondent Commissioner of Public Safety; Attorney LOTHSPEICH, DENNIS Index #11 | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Implied Consent Order Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Index #10 | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Index #9 | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Briefs Filed By: Respondent Commissioner of Public Safety Index #8 | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Briefs Index #7 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit List Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Index #6 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List Index #5 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Submissions-Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Index #4 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.