Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Closed Administratively filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Todd County, MN, . Todd County, MN Superior Courts with Benson, Daniel A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenson, Daniel A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2022 |
CategoryChange Of Name |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTodd County, MN |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Outcome TypeClosed Administratively |
Consent to Criminal Background Check
Date: July 13, 2022Application for Name Change
Date: July 13, 2022Notice of Case Filing
Date: July 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Closed administratively (Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A.)
Judge: Benson, Daniel A. |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 8 | |
July 26, 2022 | Hearing | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Criminal Background Check - Name Change Index # 7 | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Criminal Background Check - Name Change | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 4 | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 5 | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Filing Index # 6 | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.