Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Dismissal Without Prejudice filed a(n) Civil Other/Misc. case in the jurisdiction of Todd County, MN, . Todd County, MN Superior Courts with Benson, Daniel A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenson, Daniel A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Other/Misc. |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTodd County, MN |
|
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: June 24, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 24, 2022Notice of Case Filing and Assignment
Date: June 23, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: June 23, 2022Affidavit of Service
Date: June 24, 2022Answer
Date: June 24, 2022Discovery Plan
Date: June 22, 2022Certify Personal Service
Date: June 22, 2022Affidavit of Service
Date: June 22, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: June 22, 2022Amended Summons and Complaint
Date: June 22, 2022Summons and Complaint
Date: June 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 18
Judge: Benson, Daniel A. |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 17
Judge: Benson, Daniel A. |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal without prejudice (Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A.)
Judge: Benson, Daniel A. |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Dismissal Index # 16 (Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. )
Judge: Benson, Daniel A. |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 15
Judge: Benson, Daniel A. |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Index # 14
Judge: Benson, Daniel A. |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Benson, Daniel A. |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.