Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hearing filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Todd County, MN, . Todd County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2022 |
CategoryChange Of Name |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTodd County, MN |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 7 | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 6 | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Criminal Background Check - Name Change Index # 5 | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 4 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Consent to Criminal Background Check Index # 2 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 3 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Application for Name Change Index # 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.