Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Conciliation Hearing filed a(n) Conciliation case in the jurisdiction of Todd County, MN, . Todd County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTodd County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 7 (Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. )
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance Index # 6 | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Representation Index # 5 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index # 4 | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index # 2 | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 3 | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim Index # 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.