Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Conciliation Hearing filed a(n) Conciliation case in the jurisdiction of Todd County, MN, . Todd County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedJanuary 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTodd County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 10 | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Index # 9 | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Counterclaim Index # 6 | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Index # 8 | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice-Other Index # 7 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Index # 5 | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Index # 4 | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index # 2 | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.