Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Conciliation Hearing filed a(n) Conciliation case in the jurisdiction of Todd County, MN, . Todd County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationTodd County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 6 | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index # 3 | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 5 | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Index # 4 | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim Index # 1 | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Representation Index # 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.