Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stearns County Dept - Human Services, filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill case against Abdi, Maryan A., in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2022 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 17 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report Distributed | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report Index # 16 | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 15 | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing Order Index # 14 (Judicial Officer: Davick-Halfen, Kris )
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 13 | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 12 | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order-Other Index # 11 (Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. )
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.