Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Stearns County Dept - Human Services, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Fortune, Shirley A., in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts with Schultz, Heidi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchultz, Heidi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedNovember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Affidavit Regarding Background Study Index #54
Date: July 20, 2023Order Granting Guardianship Judicial Officer: Landwehr, Vicki E. Index #50
Date: May 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Representation Index #55 | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index #56 | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Regarding Background Study Index #54 | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | DHS Background Check Index #53 | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney CROWE, NATHAN SCOTT; Emergency Guardian Resource Training and Solutions; Guardian Resource Training and Solutions; Interested Party Resource Training and Solutions; Attorney THORSON, CHRISTY LYN Index #51 | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice to New Guardians Filed By: Emergency Guardian Resource Training and Solutions; Guardian Resource Training and Solutions; Interested Party Resource Training and Solutions Index #52 | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Guardianship/Rights Removed Sent to SOS | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Guardianship Judicial Officer: Landwehr, Vicki E. Index #50 | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters of Guardianship Filed By: Emergency Guardian Resource Training and Solutions; Guardian Resource Training and Solutions; Interested Party Resource Training and Solutions Index #49 | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index #48 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.