Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ruiz, Amy Jo, Stearns County Dept - Child Support - Iv-D, filed a(n) Support case against Ruiz, Pedro Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2022 |
CategorySupport |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
|
Dismiss Child Support Issue Order Judicial Officer: Brandborg, Heather Index #13
Date: December 28, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #14
Date: December 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #14 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismiss Child Support Issue Order Judicial Officer: Brandborg, Heather Index #13 | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Brandborg, Heather Index #12 | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 12 (Judicial Officer: Brandborg, Heather )
Judge: Brandborg, Heather |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Filing Filed By: Petitioner RUIZ, AMY JO; Respondent Ruiz, Pedro Antonio; Attorney Stearns County Attorney; Petitioner Stearns County Dept - CHILD SUPPORT - IV-D Index #11 | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Filing Index # 11 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing by Party Filed By: Attorney Stearns County Attorney Index #8 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Filed By: Respondent Ruiz, Pedro Antonio Index #9 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Filed By: Petitioner RUIZ, AMY JO Index #10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.