Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Selham, Esam Mansour, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Faltersack, Falyshia Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts with Mahler, Mary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMahler, Mary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 28, 2022 |
CategoryCustody |
Last RefreshedApril 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 39
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Temporary Relief Index # 38 (Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. )
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 37
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Schedule Hearing (Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. )
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 36
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Counsel Index # 35
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 34
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Schedule Hearing
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Index # 33 (Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. )
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.