Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sartell Mhp, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Zeig, Paul M - Lead Attorney, against Nelson, Janelle, in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedNovember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Judgment Index #8
Date: January 19, 2023Complaint-Civil Filed By: Plaintiff Sartell MHP, LLC; Attorney ZEIG, PAUL M Index #2
Date: November 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #8 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Defendant Nelson, Janelle; Attorney ZEIG, PAUL M Index #7 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Moehrle, Laura Index #6 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Filed By: Defendant Nelson, Janelle Index #5 | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index # 5 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney ZEIG, PAUL M Index #4 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Eviction Summons Index #3 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 4 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Eviction Summons Index # 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.