Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Djt914 Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Hanson, Craig Alan - Lead Attorney, against Mcdade, Shelly, in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 16, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Affidavit of Non-Compliance Filed By: Attorney HANSON, CRAIG ALAN Index #9
Date: January 30, 2023Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index #13
Date: March 06, 2023Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Welte, Nathaniel D Index #12
Date: February 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Filed By: Attorney HANSON, CRAIG ALAN Index #14 | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index #13 | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Welte, Nathaniel D Index #12 | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney HANSON, CRAIG ALAN; Defendant Mcdade, Shelly Index #11 | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Welte, Nathaniel D Index #10 | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Compliance Filed By: Attorney HANSON, CRAIG ALAN Index #9 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney HANSON, CRAIG ALAN; Defendant Mcdade, Shelly Index #8 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Moehrle, Laura Index #7 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Filed By: Defendant Mcdade, Shelly Index #6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.