Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Park Meadows Apartments - Centerspace, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Athmann, Lori Lynn - Lead Attorney, against Pena, Yarlin, Rosario, Julio, in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts with Moehrle, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoehrle, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 15, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Other Document Index #5
Date: December 16, 2022Other Document Index #6
Date: December 16, 2022Eviction Summons Index #3
Date: December 13, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney ATHMANN, LORI LYNN Index #4
Date: December 13, 2022Complaint-Civil Filed By: Attorney ATHMANN, LORI LYNN Index #2
Date: November 15, 2022Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. Index #13
Date: December 29, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #1
Date: November 15, 2022Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index #18
Date: January 19, 2023Judgment Index #14
Date: January 10, 2023Notice of Discrepancy Filed By: Attorney ATHMANN, LORI LYNN Index #7
Date: December 19, 2022Certify Personal Service Filed By: Defendant Pena, Yarlin Index #8
Date: December 19, 2022Certify Personal Service Filed By: Defendant Rosario, Julio Index #9
Date: December 19, 2022Request for Writ of Recovery Filed By: Attorney ATHMANN, LORI LYNN Index #12
Date: December 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index #18 | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Moehrle, Laura Filed By: Attorney ATHMANN, LORI LYNN Index #16 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Attorney ATHMANN, LORI LYNN; Defendant Pena, Yarlin; Defendant Rosario, Julio Index #15 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #14 | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. Index #13 | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Writ of Recovery Filed By: Attorney ATHMANN, LORI LYNN Index #12 | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Writ of Recovery Index # 12 | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney ATHMANN, LORI LYNN; Defendant Pena, Yarlin; Defendant Rosario, Julio Index #10 | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.