Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Park Meadows Apartments - Centerspace, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Athmann, Lori Lynn - Lead Attorney, against Dixon, Sharnique, in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts with Mahler, Mary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMahler, Mary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 15, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Certificate of Representation Index #1
Date: November 15, 2022Certify Personal Service Filed By: Defendant Dixon, Sharnique Index #5
Date: December 15, 2022Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. Index #10
Date: January 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index #14 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. Index #10 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Attorney ATHMANN, LORI LYNN; Defendant Dixon, Sharnique Index #11 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #12 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. Index #13 | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Compliance Filed By: Attorney ATHMANN, LORI LYNN Index #8 | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #9 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney ATHMANN, LORI LYNN; Defendant Dixon, Sharnique Index #7 | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Order-Other Judicial Officer: Davick-Halfen, Kris Index #6 | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.