Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Maves, Scott, filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts with Davies, Heidi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavies, Heidi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2022 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
|
Copy Request Filed By: Attorney FISCHER, TRENT JAMES Index #18
Date: October 12, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #17
Date: October 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Consent to Final Acct-Issuance of Decree-Order of Distrib Index #28 | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Claim and Withdrawal of Demand for Notice Index #31 | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Accounting Index #29 | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Claim and Withdrawal of Demand for Notice Index #32 | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Claim and Withdrawal of Demand for Notice Index #30 | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #27 | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition to Allow Final Acctg., Settle and Distribute Estate Filed By: Attorney FISCHER, TRENT JAMES Index #26 | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Written Statement of Claim Filed By: Name Not Available Online Index #25 | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Written Statement of Claim Filed By: Name Not Available Online Index #24 | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.