Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hearing filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts with Remick, Jeffrey Scott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRemick, Jeffrey Scott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2022 |
CategoryFamily Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 52 (Judicial Officer: Remick, Jeffrey Scott )
Judge: Remick, Jeffrey Scott |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Remick, Jeffrey Scott |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 51
Judge: Remick, Jeffrey Scott |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Other Document Index # 50
Judge: Remick, Jeffrey Scott |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Petitioner Index # 49
Judge: Remick, Jeffrey Scott |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Respondent Index # 47
Judge: Remick, Jeffrey Scott |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Medical Record Index # 48
Judge: Remick, Jeffrey Scott |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 46
Judge: Remick, Jeffrey Scott |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of No Service Index # 45
Judge: Remick, Jeffrey Scott |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index # 44
Judge: Remick, Jeffrey Scott |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.