Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Default Hearing filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2022 |
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index # 16 | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 15 | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Default Scheduling Request Index # 13 | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 14 | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Military Status Index # 12 | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Default Index # 11 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 9 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Filing Index # 10 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Index # 8 (Judicial Officer: Harbott, Corey )
Judge: Harbott, Corey |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.