Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Excuria, P.C., filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Johnston, Jacey Layne - Lead Attorney, against Swang, Jenny Ann, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts with Davies, Heidi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavies, Heidi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 07, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
|
Statement of Claim Index #1
Date: November 07, 2022Summons Index #3
Date: November 08, 2022Power of Attorney Index #2
Date: November 07, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #4
Date: November 08, 2022Certify Personal Service Index #5
Date: November 22, 2022Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Davies, Heidi Index #8
Date: December 15, 2022Stipulation Index #6
Date: December 14, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #9
Date: December 15, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #7
Date: December 14, 2022Returned Mail Index #10
Date: December 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Index #10 | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Davies, Heidi Index #8 | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #9 | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation Index #6 | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #7 | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index #5 | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index # 5 | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index #3 | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #4 | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index # 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.