Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bjerga Feed Stores Inc, filed a(n) Conciliation case against Luckens Trucks & Parts Inc, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts with Davies, Heidi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavies, Heidi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
|
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3
Date: November 02, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #4
Date: November 28, 2022Counterclaim Filed By: Defendant Luckens Trucks & Parts Inc Index #5
Date: November 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #11 | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #12 | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Davies, Heidi Index #10 | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Davies, Heidi Index #9 | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Counterclaim Filed By: Defendant Luckens Trucks & Parts Inc Index #5 | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Power of Attorney Index #6 | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice-Other Index #7 | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Index #8 | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice-Other Index # 7 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.