Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Index # 12 filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBentz, Darci J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 17
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer and Counterpetition Index # 16
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Schedule Hearing
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Deficiency Index # 15
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer and Counterpetition Index # 14
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 13
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Index # 12 (Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. )
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 10
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Proceeding In Forma Pauperis Index # 9
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Index # 8
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.