Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Order To Show Cause Hearing filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrushenski, Michael D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 36
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 35
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Index # 34 (Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D )
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 32
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 31
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Schedule Hearing
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Index # 30
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Attendance-class Index # 29
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Deficiency Index # 28
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.