Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Human Services Of Faribault & Martin Counties, Mccarthy, Samantha Ann, filed a(n) Support case against Diaz-Lopez, Guillermo, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Rolfsrud, Stephen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRolfsrud, Stephen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2022 |
CategorySupport |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Respondent DIAZ-LOPEZ, GUILLERMO; Petitioner HUMAN SERVICES OF FARIBAULT & MARTIN COUNTIES; Attorney KINNEY, SUELANA MARLENE CARTER; Petitioner MCCARTHY, SAMANTHA ANN Index #23 | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Child Support Judicial Officer: Rolfsrud, Stephen Index #22 | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Rolfsrud, Stephen Index #21 | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Respondent DIAZ-LOPEZ, GUILLERMO; Petitioner MCCARTHY, SAMANTHA ANN Index #20 | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 20 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Hearing Index #18 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Hearing Index #19 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Hearing Index # 19 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Hearing Index # 18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.