Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bgb Properties, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Greiner, Derrick Mitchell - Lead Attorney, against Smith, Sandra Lee, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrushenski, Michael D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index #13
Date: November 29, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #5
Date: October 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Index #13 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Filed By: Plaintiff BGB Properties, LLC; Defendant Smith, Sandra Lee Index #11 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #12 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #10 | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 10
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #8 | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion and Motion Index #9 | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion and Motion Index # 9
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.