Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Murphy, Charles M., Murphy, Debra, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Hovey, Steven John - Lead Attorney, against Boekette Building Supply, Inc., A K A Boekette Enterprises, Llc, represented by Schueler, Ken Douglas - Lead Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrushenski, Michael D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Notice of Filing of Order Index #14
Date: November 29, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #31
Date: September 01, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #28
Date: September 01, 2023Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #30
Date: September 01, 2023Exhibit List Index #24
Date: July 28, 2023Proposed Verdict Index #23
Date: July 10, 2023Proposed Jury Instructions Index #19
Date: July 07, 2023Proposed Jury Instructions Index #22
Date: July 10, 2023Stipulation Index #27
Date: September 01, 2023Correspondence Index #25
Date: July 31, 2023Notice of Judicial Determination Index #26
Date: August 02, 2023Witness List Index #20
Date: July 10, 2023Exhibit List Index #21
Date: July 10, 2023Joint Informational Statement Index #7
Date: October 10, 2022Notice of Judicial Determination Index #11
Date: October 13, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #8
Date: October 12, 2022Scheduling Order Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #13
Date: November 28, 2022Exhibit List Index #16
Date: July 07, 2023Request for Continuance Index #9
Date: October 13, 2022Answer Index #5
Date: September 20, 2022Correspondence Index #1
Date: September 09, 2022Proposed Verdict Index #18
Date: July 07, 2023Witness List Index #17
Date: July 07, 2023Correspondence Index #15
Date: July 07, 2023Certificate of Representation Index #3
Date: September 09, 2022Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #4
Date: September 09, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #6
Date: September 20, 2022Summons and Complaint Index #2
Date: September 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #31 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #28 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #30 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation Index #27 | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Judicial Determination Index #26 | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #25 | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit List Index #24 | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Verdict Index #23 | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Jury Instructions Index #22 | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Witness List Index #20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.