Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hearing filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrushenski, Michael D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2022 |
CategoryChange Of Name |
Last RefreshedNovember 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Publication Index # 16
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 15
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing by Publication Index # 14
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 13
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Service by Publication or Alternative Means Index # 12 (Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D )
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 10
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Service by Publication or Alternative Means Index # 9
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 8
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Deficiency Index # 7
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Criminal Background Check - Name Change Index # 6
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.