Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Elite Properties Mn Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Danielson, Silas Leonard - Lead Attorney, against Johnson, Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrushenski, Michael D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeEviction, Non-Payment Of Rent - Judgment |
Judgment
Date: August 30, 2022Affidavit of Service by Posting
Date: September 01, 2022Proposed Order or Document
Date: August 30, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: August 30, 2022Request for Writ of Recovery
Date: August 29, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: August 16, 2022Eviction Summons
Date: August 16, 2022Complaint-Civil
Date: August 12, 2022Affidavit of Service
Date: August 17, 2022Order and Judgment-Eviction
Date: August 29, 2022Certificate of Representation
Date: August 12, 2022Writ of Recovery of Premises
Date: August 30, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #5
Date: August 17, 2022Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #7
Date: August 29, 2022Judgment Index #8
Date: August 30, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #9
Date: August 30, 2022Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #13
Date: September 01, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #1
Date: August 12, 2022Complaint-Civil Index #2
Date: August 12, 2022Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #12
Date: August 30, 2022Request for Writ of Recovery Index #6
Date: August 29, 2022Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #10
Date: August 30, 2022Eviction Summons Index #3
Date: August 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #13 | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Recovery of Premises
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #8 | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #9 | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #12 | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.