Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Air Med, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Edman, Michael Paul - Lead Attorney, against Lamont, Bethany, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrushenski, Michael Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: December 22, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #2
Date: December 23, 2022Eviction Summons Index #3
Date: December 23, 2022Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #4
Date: January 06, 2023Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice Index #6
Date: April 02, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #5
Date: January 06, 2023Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #7
Date: April 03, 2023Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #8
Date: April 03, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #9
Date: April 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #9 | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #7 | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #8 | |
April 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice Index #6 | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #4 | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #5 | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #2 | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Eviction Summons Index #3 | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Eviction Summons Index # 3
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.