Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
River Center Properties, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Edmundson, Sara Lynn - Lead Attorney, against Wichmann, Chere, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBentz, Darci Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Other Document Index #3
Date: November 18, 2022Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: November 18, 2022Other Document Index #4
Date: November 18, 2022Eviction Summons Index #6
Date: November 21, 2022Other Document Index #5
Date: November 18, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #7
Date: November 21, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #10
Date: December 09, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #2
Date: November 18, 2022Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. Index #9
Date: December 09, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #8
Date: November 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #10 | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. Index #9 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #8 | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 8
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Eviction Summons Index #6 | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #7 | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 7
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Eviction Summons Index # 6
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Other Document Index #3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.