Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
River Center Properties, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Edmundson, Sara Lynn - Lead Attorney, against Flores, Abelardo, Green, Gloria, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrushenski, Michael Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Affidavit of Service Index #9
Date: November 21, 2022Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: November 17, 2022Other Document Index #5
Date: November 17, 2022Other Document Index #4
Date: November 17, 2022Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #11
Date: December 19, 2022Judgment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #12
Date: December 20, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #8
Date: November 21, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #2
Date: November 17, 2022Other Document Index #3
Date: November 17, 2022Eviction Summons Index #7
Date: November 17, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #6
Date: November 17, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #13
Date: December 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #12 | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #13 | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #11 | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing Filed By: Defendant Flores, Abelardo | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney EDMUNDSON, SARA LYNN; Defendant Flores, Abelardo; Defendant Green, Gloria Index #10 | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #9 | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #8 | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 9
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.