Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kohlmeyer Hagen Law Office Chtd., filed a(n) Conciliation case against Melvin, Krista, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBentz, Darci J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
|
Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Melvin, Krista Index #12
Date: January 13, 2023Notice of Change of Address Index #8
Date: January 09, 2023Order-Change of Venue Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. Index #9
Date: January 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Melvin, Krista Index #13 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Melvin, Krista Index #12 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order-Change of Venue Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. Index #9 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Plaintiff Kohlmeyer Hagen Law Office Chtd.; Defendant Melvin, Krista Index #10 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Change of Venue To Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. Index #11 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address Index #8 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Index # 8
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice-Other Index #7 | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice-Other Index # 7
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.