Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hutchinson Auto Sales, filed a(n) Conciliation case against Flores, Perla, in the jurisdiction of Mcleod County, MN, . Mcleod County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMcleod County, MN |
|
Proposed Order or Document Index #4
Date: October 05, 2022Affidavit of Service Filed By: Defendant Flores, Perla Index #5
Date: October 13, 2022Statement of Claim Filed By: Plaintiff Hutchinson Auto Sales Index #1
Date: October 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #13 | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Defendant Flores, Perla; Plaintiff Hutchinson Auto Sales Index #12 | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Yira, Markus Index #11 | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Compliance Filed By: Plaintiff Hutchinson Auto Sales Index #10 | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Defendant Flores, Perla; Plaintiff Hutchinson Auto Sales Index #9 | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Order-Other Judicial Officer: Yira, Markus Index #8 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Yira, Markus Index #7 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 7 (Judicial Officer: Yira, Markus )
Judge: Yira, Markus |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Defendant Flores, Perla; Plaintiff Hutchinson Auto Sales Index #6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.