Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sw Health & Human Services, filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill & Chemically Dependent case against Fuchs, Alyssa Rose, in the jurisdiction of Lyon County, MN, . Lyon County, MN Superior Courts with Zimmer, Tricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZimmer, Tricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2022 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill & Chemically Dependent |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLyon County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Proceeding and Discharging Patient Judicial Officer: Zimmer, Tricia B Index #26 | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #25 | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Treatment Report Index #24 | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | 60-90 Day Commitment Report Index #23 | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Change of Status Report Index #22 | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #21 | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index #20 | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #19 | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Commitment Index #18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.