Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Geurts, Samantha T., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Geurts, Jason P., in the jurisdiction of Lyon County, MN, . Lyon County, MN Superior Courts with Dietrich, Michelle A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDietrich, Michelle A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 25, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLyon County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Order for Initial Case Management Conference Judicial Officer: Dietrich, Michelle A. Index #7
Date: November 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Dissolution Judicial Officer: Dietrich, Michelle A. Index #25 | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Dietrich, Michelle A. Index #23 | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index #24 | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party Index #22 | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #20 | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Index #21 | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution Judicial Officer: Dietrich, Michelle A. Index #19 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #18 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Index # 18
Judge: Dietrich, Michelle A. |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Dietrich, Michelle A. Index #17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.