Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sl 500 Village Dr Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Hage, Brian Elliot - Lead Attorney, against Lewis, James, Lewis, Marcella, Lewis, Sherrita, in the jurisdiction of Lyon County, MN, . Lyon County, MN Superior Courts with Zimmer, Tricia B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZimmer, Tricia B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 27, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLyon County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Notice of Judicial Determination Index #8
Date: November 01, 2022Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Zimmer, Tricia B Index #15
Date: November 15, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #11
Date: November 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Attorney HAGE, BRIAN ELLIOT; Defendant Lewis, James; Defendant Lewis, Marcella; Defendant Lewis, Sherrita Index #17 | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #16 | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Zimmer, Tricia B Index #15 | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index #14 | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing Filed By: Defendant Lewis, James; Defendant Lewis, Marcella; Defendant Lewis, Sherrita | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #11 | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #12 | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #13 | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 13
Judge: Zimmer, Tricia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.