Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Accounts Management Inc., filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Junso, Robert Dean - Lead Attorney, against Leon, Martin, Meza, Daisy Gigi, in the jurisdiction of Lyon County, MN, . Lyon County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLyon County, MN |
|
Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Zimmer, Tricia B Index #6
Date: November 15, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #7
Date: November 15, 2022Statement of Claim Index #1
Date: October 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #9 | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Zimmer, Tricia B Index #6 | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #7 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index #8 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Filed By: Attorney JUNSO, ROBERT DEAN; Defendant LEON, MARTIN; Defendant MEZA, DAISY GIGI Index #5 | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Filed By: Defendant LEON, MARTIN; Defendant MEZA, DAISY GIGI Index #3 | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney JUNSO, ROBERT DEAN; Defendant LEON, MARTIN; Defendant MEZA, DAISY GIGI Index #4 | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index # 5 | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.